NJ A2627 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S335
Note: Carry Over of previous A4367
Note: Carry Over of previous A4367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey First-Time Home Buyer Savings Account Program; provides gross income tax benefits for certain contributions to and earnings on assets maintained in accounts established under program.
Title
Establishes New Jersey First-Time Home Buyer Savings Account Program; provides gross income tax benefits for certain contributions to and earnings on assets maintained in accounts established under program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2627 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1762 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4367 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2228 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S1762 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4367 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S2228 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2627 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2627_I1.HTM |