NJ A2581 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2082
Note: Carry Foward to future S2023
Note: Carry Foward to future S2023
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires OAL to maintain Internet database summarizing all State rule-making actions.
Title
Requires OAL to maintain Internet database summarizing all State rule-making actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2581 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2581 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1319 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2581 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1319 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee