NJ A2578 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Approved P.L.2013, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Approved P.L.2013, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Internet gaming at Atlantic City casinos under certain circumstances.*
Title
Authorizes Internet gaming at Atlantic City casinos under certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Rep. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1565 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1565 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.27. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (34-1) (Whelan) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-5-1) |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-3) |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S1565 (SS) |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-25-3) |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Assembly Substitution (Burzichelli) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1565 (Same As) 2012-12-20 - Substituted by A2578 (AS)