NJ S1565 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Substituted by A2578 (AS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Internet gaming at Atlantic City casinos under certain circumstances.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Internet gaming at Atlantic City casinos under certain circumstances.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Senate Substitute (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-20SenateSubstituted by A2578 (AS)
2012-12-20SenateSenate Substitution (31-2) (Lesniak)
2012-05-24SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Lesniak)
2012-05-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-03-05SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2012-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-02-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2578 (Same As) 2013-02-26 - Approved P.L.2013, c.27.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback