NJ A2527 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1109
Note: Carry Over of previous S60
Note: Carry Over of previous S60
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by S1388 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by S1388 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Military Pro Bono Program" to provide pro bono legal representation to active-duty members of Armed Forces, Reserve components, members of National Guard, and veterans.
Title
Establishes "Military Pro Bono Program" to provide pro bono legal representation to active-duty members of Armed Forces, Reserve components, members of National Guard, and veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S1388 (1R) |
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1388 (Same As) 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.91.
A1109 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S60 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1109 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S60 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee