NJ A2463 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2858
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S806 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S806 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owner or operator of certain trains to have discharge response, cleanup, and contingency plans to transport certain hazardous materials by rail; requires NJ DOT to request bridge inspection reports from US DOT.*
Title
Requires owner or operator of certain trains to have discharge response, cleanup, and contingency plans to transport certain hazardous materials by rail; requires NJ DOT to request bridge inspection reports from US DOT.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S806 (1R) |
2016-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Same As) 2017-07-13 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S2858 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S2858 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading