NJ A2455 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.320.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.320.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program in DOE to support FIRST Robotics Programs in school districts.
Title
Establishes pilot program in DOE to support FIRST Robotics Programs in school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2204 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2204 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.320. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S2204 (1R) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A2455 (1R)