NJ A2388 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the use of electronic communication in child custody arrangements that include parenting time.*
Title
Permits the use of electronic communication in child custody arrangements that include parenting time.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2186 (Same As) 2012-09-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee