NJ A2336 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1035

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.264.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits health insurance carriers from requiring optometrists to become providers with vision care plans as condition of becoming providers in carriers' panel of providers; prohibits certain practices under vision care provider contracts.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits health insurance carriers from requiring optometrists to become providers with vision care plans as condition of becoming providers in carriers' panel of providers; prohibits certain practices under vision care provider contracts.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3108 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.264.
2017-12-18SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2017-12-18SenateSubstituted for S3108 (1R)
2017-12-11SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-12-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2017-06-08AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jones)
2017-06-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1035 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3108 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A2336 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback