NJ S3108 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1035
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A2336 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A2336 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurance carriers from requiring optometrists to become providers with vision care plans as condition of becoming providers in carriers' panel of providers; prohibits certain practices under vision care provider contracts.*
Title
Prohibits health insurance carriers from requiring optometrists to become providers with vision care plans as condition of becoming providers in carriers' panel of providers; prohibits certain practices under vision care provider contracts.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A2336 (2R) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2336 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.264.
A1035 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1035 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session