NJ A2294 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4696

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands civil rights protections to include breastfeeding; requires employers to provide reasonable accommodations for breastfeeding mothers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands civil rights protections to include breastfeeding; requires employers to provide reasonable accommodations for breastfeeding mothers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2709 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.263.
2017-12-18SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2017-12-18SenateSubstituted for S2709
2017-12-11SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-12-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
2016-10-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4696 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2709 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A2294

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback