NJ S2709 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A2294
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A2294
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands civil rights protections to include breastfeeding; requires employers to provide reasonable accommodations for breastfeeding mothers.
Title
Expands civil rights protections to include breastfeeding; requires employers to provide reasonable accommodations for breastfeeding mothers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A2294 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2294 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.263.
A4696 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4696 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee