NJ A2288 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-18 - Senate Amendment (36-0) (Rice)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-18 - Senate Amendment (36-0) (Rice)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crime of entering into certain restricted airport areas.
Title
Establishes crime of entering into certain restricted airport areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Rice) | |
2010-10-18 | Substituted for S1470 | |
2010-07-19 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-05-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1470 (Same As) 2010-10-18 - Substituted by A2288