NJ A222 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-13-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.149.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Library Construction Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $125,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance capital projects at public libraries; appropriates $5,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Library Construction Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $125,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance capital projects at public libraries; appropriates $5,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2171 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Motion to Suspend Rules (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.149.
2017-07-04SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2)
2017-07-04SenateSubstituted for S2171 (2R)
2017-06-29SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (63-12-1)
2017-06-22AssemblyMotion Suspend 18:1 (DeAngelo) (Voice)
2017-06-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-04-04AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3966 (Carry Over) 2014-12-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2171 (Same As) 2017-07-04 - Substituted by A222 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback