NJ S2171 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Substituted by A222 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Library Construction Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $125,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance capital projects at public libraries; appropriates $5,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Library Construction Bond Act"; authorizes issuance of $125,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance capital projects at public libraries; appropriates $5,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04SenateSubstituted by A222 (1R)
2017-06-29SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-06-19SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-19SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-05-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A222 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.149.
A3966 (Carry Over) 2014-12-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback