NJ A2189 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.80.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to include instruction on consequences of distributing and soliciting sexually explicit images through electronic means as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education. *
Title
Requires school districts to include instruction on consequences of distributing and soliciting sexually explicit images through electronic means as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2092 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2092 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.80. |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2092 (1R) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2092 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2189 (1R)