NJ S2092 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2189 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2189 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to include instruction on consequences of distributing and soliciting sexually explicit images through electronic means as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education. *
Title
Requires school districts to include instruction on consequences of distributing and soliciting sexually explicit images through electronic means as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A2189 (1R) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2189 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.80.