NJ A2123 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1885
Note: Carry Over of previous A5295
Note: Carry Over of previous S1864
Note: Carry Over of previous A5295
Note: Carry Over of previous S1864
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety Advisory Council.
Title
Establishes Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety Advisory Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2123 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5295 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1915 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1864 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5295 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1915 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1864 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2123 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2123_I1.HTM |