NJ A21 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.16.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Cannabis Regulatory, Enforcement Assistance, and Marketplace Modernization Act"; legalizes personal use cannabis for certain adults, subject to State regulation; decriminalizes small amount marijuana and hashish possession; removes marijuana as Schedule I drug.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Cannabis Regulatory, Enforcement Assistance, and Marketplace Modernization Act"; legalizes personal use cannabis for certain adults, subject to State regulation; decriminalizes small amount marijuana and hashish possession; removes marijuana as Schedule I drug.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S21 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.16.
2020-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-17)
2020-12-17SenateSubstituted for S21 (2R)
2020-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (49-24-6)
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-14AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-19AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-11-09AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S21 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A21 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback