NJ S21 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A21 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Cannabis Regulatory, Enforcement Assistance, and Marketplace Modernization Act"; legalizes personal use cannabis for certain adults, subject to State regulation; decriminalizes small amount marijuana and hashish possession; removes marijuana as Schedule I drug.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Cannabis Regulatory, Enforcement Assistance, and Marketplace Modernization Act"; legalizes personal use cannabis for certain adults, subject to State regulation; decriminalizes small amount marijuana and hashish possession; removes marijuana as Schedule I drug.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-17SenateSubstituted by A21 (2R)
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10SenateRecommitted to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-11-19SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-11-09SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-11-09SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-11-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A21 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.16.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback