NJ A2087 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3063
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.75.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.75.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grants drivers additional time to resolve parking violations prior to license or registration suspension.*
Title
Grants drivers additional time to resolve parking violations prior to license or registration suspension.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2792 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.75. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by S2792 (SCS) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3063 (Carry Over) 2014-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2792 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2087 (1R)
S2792 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2087 (1R)