NJ A2081 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1903
Note: Carry Foward to future A1678
Note: Carry Foward to future S2916
Note: Carry Over of previous A2580
Note: Carry Foward to future A1678
Note: Carry Foward to future S2916
Note: Carry Over of previous A2580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for priority consideration, by DCA, DEP, DOT, and municipalities, of permit applications for green building projects.
Title
Provides for priority consideration, by DCA, DEP, DOT, and municipalities, of permit applications for green building projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-19-1) |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2081 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2081 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2081 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2580 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3129 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2081 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2081 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2580 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3129 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading