NJ A2580 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2081
Note: Carry Foward to future S3129
Note: Carry Foward to future S3129
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for priority consideration, by DCA, DEP, DOT, and municipalities, of permit applications for green building projects.
Title
Provides for priority consideration, by DCA, DEP, DOT, and municipalities, of permit applications for green building projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-20-0) |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2580 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2580 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2580 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading