NJ A2080 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ STEM Entrepreneur Fellowship Program in DOLWD.
Title
Establishes NJ STEM Entrepreneur Fellowship Program in DOLWD.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A614 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2614 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2614 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee