NJ A2073 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain offers and sales of securities from registration.*
Title
Exempts certain offers and sales of securities from registration.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S712 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S712 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S712 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.128. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-0) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Substituted for S712 (SCS) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Assembly Substitution (Fuentes) |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S712 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A2073 (AS)