NJ S712 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A2073 (AS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides certain offers and sales of securities from registration.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides certain offers and sales of securities from registration.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-23SenateSubstituted by A2073 (AS)
2015-06-08SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2014-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2073 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.128.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback