NJ A20 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Lost in the Assembly AVOR (47-33-0) (Moriarty)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Lost in the Assembly AVOR (47-33-0) (Moriarty)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supplements the State annual appropriations act for the State fiscal year 2010-2011, makes appropriations for Pharmaceutical Assistance to the Aged and Disabled Programs and the Homestead Rebate/Credit Program.
Title
Supplements the State annual appropriations act for the State fiscal year 2010-2011, makes appropriations for Pharmaceutical Assistance to the Aged and Disabled Programs and the Homestead Rebate/Credit Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Veto Override (Y: 47 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appeal Ruling of Chair (Y: 32 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appeal Ruling of Chair (Y: 32 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Lost in the Assembly AVOR (47-33-0) (Moriarty) | |
2010-06-10 | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly | |
2010-05-20 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-17) | |
2010-05-20 | Substituted for S20 | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Assembly (46-32-0) | |
2010-05-20 | Motion Appeal Ruling of Chair (32-46-0) | |
2010-05-13 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S20 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Substituted by A20
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A20 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A0500/20_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A20 |