NJ A1992 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4158

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.470.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Call Center Jobs Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Call Center Jobs Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1780 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.470.
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-21-0)
2019-12-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-12-16SenatePassed by the Senate (22-17)
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted for S1780 (1R)
2019-03-25SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Diegnan)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (51-23-1)
2018-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4158 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1780 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1992 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback