NJ S1780 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3113

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Call Center Jobs Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Call Center Jobs Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1992 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3113 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback