NJ A1953 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4552
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows installment payments for senior and disabled property taxpayers to repay overpayments of homestead credits and homestead property tax reimbursements.
Title
Allows installment payments for senior and disabled property taxpayers to repay overpayments of homestead credits and homestead property tax reimbursements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2448 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.207. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2448 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4552 (Carry Over) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2448 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A1953
S2448 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A1953