NJ A1929 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5475
Note: Carry Over of previous S3559
Note: Carry Over of previous S3559
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S772 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by S772 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Agriculture to establish New Jersey Minority, Women, and Underserved Farmer Registry.
Title
Directs Department of Agriculture to establish New Jersey Minority, Women, and Underserved Farmer Registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S772 (1R) |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5475 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S3559 (Carry Over) 2021-06-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S772 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Approved P.L.2022, c.112.
S3559 (Carry Over) 2021-06-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S772 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Approved P.L.2022, c.112.