NJ A1833 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1469

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health benefits coverage for adolescent depression screenings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health benefits coverage for adolescent depression screenings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1469 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1000 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback