NJ S1000 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1140
Note: Carry Foward to future A3548
Note: Carry Over of previous S1302
Note: Carry Foward to future A3548
Note: Carry Over of previous S1302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health benefits coverage for juvenile depression screenings.
Title
Requires health benefits coverage for juvenile depression screenings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1000 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1302 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1833 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1000 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1302 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1833 (Same As) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee