NJ A1820 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1582
Note: Carry Foward to future S2625
Note: Carry Over of previous A2826
Note: Carry Over of previous A2826
Note: Carry Foward to future S2625
Note: Carry Over of previous A2826
Note: Carry Over of previous A2826
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Dietitian/Nutritionist Licensing Act."
Title
"Dietitian/Nutritionist Licensing Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1820 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A1820 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A2826 (Carry Over) 2014-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1318 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2826 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1820 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A2826 (Carry Over) 2014-03-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1318 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2826 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A1820 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A2000/1820_I1.HTM |