NJ A1815 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1995
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to conduct survey on status of antenatal and prenatal care clinics in New Jersey.
Title
Requires DOH to conduct survey on status of antenatal and prenatal care clinics in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Tennille McCoy [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Andrea Katz [D] | Rep. Garnet Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1995 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee