NJ A1781 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Nikhil's Law"; requires MVC to inform and test drivers on dangers of failing to comply with traffic safety laws and "STOP for Nikhil Safety Pledge."
Title
"Nikhil's Law"; requires MVC to inform and test drivers on dangers of failing to comply with traffic safety laws and "STOP for Nikhil Safety Pledge."
Sponsors
Rep. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Charles Mainor [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.78. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2211 (1R) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2211 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A1781 (1R)