NJ S2211 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-29 - Substituted by A1781 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Nikhil's Law"; requires MVC to inform and test drivers on dangers of failing to comply with traffic safety laws and "STOP for Nikhil Safety Pledge."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Nikhil's Law"; requires MVC to inform and test drivers on dangers of failing to comply with traffic safety laws and "STOP for Nikhil Safety Pledge."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29SenateSubstituted by A1781 (1R)
2015-05-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-06-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1781 (Same As) 2015-08-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.78.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback