NJ A1733 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Approved P.L.2015, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Approved P.L.2015, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns sale of certain motor fuel during certain emergencies.
Title
Concerns sale of certain motor fuel during certain emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S314 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S314 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S314 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.113. |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Substituted for S314 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S314 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A1733