NJ A1715 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3795
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Approved P.L.2023, c.145.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Approved P.L.2023, c.145.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires standard certification period of 12 and 24 months, under certain circumstances, within SNAP.
Title
Requires standard certification period of 12 and 24 months, under certain circumstances, within SNAP.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1713 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1713 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.145. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-5-1) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S1713 (2R) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-11-2) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3795 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1713 (Same As) 2023-06-26 - Substituted by A1715 (2R)
S1713 (Same As) 2023-06-26 - Substituted by A1715 (2R)