NJ S1713 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Substituted by A1715 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Substituted by A1715 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires standard certification period of 12 and 24 months, under certain circumstances, within SNAP.
Title
Requires standard certification period of 12 and 24 months, under certain circumstances, within SNAP.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A1715 (2R) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1715 (Same As) 2023-08-17 - Approved P.L.2023, c.145.
A3795 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3795 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee