NJ A1707 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1083
Note: Carry Over of previous S1209
Note: Carry Over of previous S1209
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.235.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes presumption that VCCO will order payment to victim of crime.
Title
Establishes presumption that VCCO will order payment to victim of crime.
Sponsors
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Ellen Park [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3700 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3700 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.235. |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Substituted for S3700 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1083 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1209 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3700 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A1707 (ACS)
S1209 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3700 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A1707 (ACS)