NJ A1703 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2453
Note: Carry Over of previous A5915
Note: Carry Over of previous S1233
Note: Carry Over of previous A5915
Note: Carry Over of previous S1233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain persons and business entities to maintain comprehensive information security program.
Title
Requires certain persons and business entities to maintain comprehensive information security program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1703 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5915 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3412 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5915 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S3412 (Same As) 2022-12-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1703 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2000/1703_I1.HTM |