NJ S1233 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1703
Note: Carry Foward to future S3412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2692
Note: Carry Over of previous A1766
Note: Carry Foward to future S3412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2692
Note: Carry Over of previous A1766
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain persons and business entities to maintain comprehensive information security program.
Title
Requires certain persons and business entities to maintain comprehensive information security program.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2692 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5915 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1766 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1233 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2692 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5915 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A1766 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee