NJ A1640 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1065
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates five percent down payment requirement for bond ordinances approved by counties and municipalities.
Title
Eliminates five percent down payment requirement for bond ordinances approved by counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-19-0) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1065 (Carry Over) 2014-10-09 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2334 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2334 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee