NJ A1626 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2046
Note: Carry Foward to future S3774
Note: Carry Over of previous A2104
Note: Carry Foward to future S3774
Note: Carry Over of previous A2104
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to issue written decision concerning utility rate increase approvals to public via its website.
Title
Requires BPU to issue written decision concerning utility rate increase approvals to public via its website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1626 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1626 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2104 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S608 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1626 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2104 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S608 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee