NJ A2046 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1626
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to issue written decision concerning utility rate increase approvals to public via its website.
Title
Requires BPU to issue written decision concerning utility rate increase approvals to public via its website.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Howarth [R] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1626 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3774 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3774 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee