NJ A1600 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A745
Note: Carry Foward to future S480
Note: Carry Over of previous A3308
Note: Carry Over of previous S1619
Note: Carry Foward to future S480
Note: Carry Over of previous A3308
Note: Carry Over of previous S1619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Pending: Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Pending: Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies crime of unlawful access concerning certain password protected communications in electronic storage.
Title
Clarifies crime of unlawful access concerning certain password protected communications in electronic storage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1600 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A1600 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A3308 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1619 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1179 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1600 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A3308 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1619 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1179 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1600 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2000/1600_I1.HTM |