NJ A1564 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1050
Note: Carry Over of previous S2037
Note: Carry Over of previous S2037
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises equine animal activities law in accordance with recommendations of New Jersey Law Revision Commission to clarify responsibility and liability issues.
Title
Revises equine animal activities law in accordance with recommendations of New Jersey Law Revision Commission to clarify responsibility and liability issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1050 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1349 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2037 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1349 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2037 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee