NJ A1050 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1564
Note: Carry Foward to future S1349
Note: Carry Over of previous A4417
Note: Carry Foward to future S1349
Note: Carry Over of previous A4417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises equine animal activities law in accordance with recommendations of New Jersey Law Revision Commission to clarify responsibility and liability issues.
Title
Revises equine animal activities law in accordance with recommendations of New Jersey Law Revision Commission to clarify responsibility and liability issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1050 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1050 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4417 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2037 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1050 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4417 (Carry Over) 2016-12-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2037 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee