NJ A1563 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1045
Note: Carry Over of previous S2856
Note: Carry Over of previous S2856
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies sales tax collection responsibilities of horse-boarding businesses in New Jersey.
Title
Clarifies sales tax collection responsibilities of horse-boarding businesses in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1045 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S1973 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2856 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1045 (2R)
S1973 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2856 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1045 (2R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1563 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1563_I1.HTM |